Grant v. Chatham County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Louis O'Neil Grant
Defendant: Chatham County Detention Center, Sheriff John Wilcher, Officer Cody and Officer Warrez
Case Number: 4:2021cv00324
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to sender - No longer at this address - Not here. #4 Order & PLRA forms. Mail sent to Louis O'Neil Grant. (csr)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Mail #3 Returned as Undeliverable, "RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD". Mail sent to Louis O'Neil Grant. (gmh)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must furnish the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the recommendation of dismissal of this case without prejudice. PLRA due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/22/2021. (kjm)
November 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/6/2021. (kjm)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Chatham County Detention Center, John Wilcher, Cody, Warrez. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 11/22/2021. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement) (ca)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Louis O'Neil Grant. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(ca) Modified on 11/8/2021 (JH).
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Louis O'Neil Grant.(ca) Modified on 11/8/2021 (JH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Chatham County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis O'Neil Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff John Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Warrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?