Monroe v. Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Monroe
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., SEV Berwick Store LLC a Georgia Limited Liability Company doing business as Southeast Vapes and E-Cigs, Hohm Tech, Inc., John Does (A-Z) and ABC Inc. (1-100)
Case Number: 4:2021cv00357
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #14 Order granting in part and denying in part #12 Joint Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this case are Stayed until August 3, 2022. The parties are Directed to confer and file a joint notice no later than 90 days from the date of this Order. (Joint Notice due by 5/9/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/8/2022. (ca) Modified on 2/8/2022 (thb).
February 8, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/3/2022 re stay. Joint Notice due by 5/9/2022. (thb)
February 3, 2022 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray: Status Conference held by VTC on 2/3/2022. (MD)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave of Absence for attorney William Hunter for the dates of March 10, 2022 through March 18, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/28/22. (wwp)
January 27, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Andrea Monroe by Andrea Monroe. Responses due by 2/10/2022. (Hunter, William)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Leave of Absence for Attorney William J. Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on January 27, 2022. (jrb)
January 27, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Andrea Monroe. (JH)
January 26, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Andrea Monroe. (thb)
January 25, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Andrea Monroe by Andrea Monroe. Responses due by 2/8/2022. (Hunter, William)
January 19, 2022 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Andrea Monroe. (Major, George)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court previously ordered the parties to confer and submit a joint status report within fourteen days of the state courts disposition of a related proceeding. See doc. #14 at 3. The parties have informed the Court that the related proceeding has concluded and they have requested a status conference. Status Conference by video set for 2/3/2022 02:00 PM in SAV-MagVTC before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Parties will be contacted by email with VTC (TEAMS) login instructions. The parties are advised that their informal notice of the state court's disposition does not fully satisfy their obligation to submit a status report, pursuant to the Order. The parties shall file a more comprehensive joint status report setting forth their respective positions with regard to the stay and any other topic they intend to address at the status conference. Status Report due by 1/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/13/2022. (MD)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Joint MOTION to Stay. The case is stayed pending a ruling by the state court on the challenge to the default judgment. No later than one hundred and eighty days from the date of this Order or fourteen days after the state court enters a ruling on the default judgment, whichever is earlier, the parties are directed to confer and submit a status report. The deadline for any party to serve an answer, or other responsive pleading is stayed and is extended until twenty-one days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/06/2022. (jlh)
January 6, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/5/2022. (jlh)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion to Stay. The parties having jointly requested a stay, doc. 12, and Defendant Samsung SDI America, Inc.s deadline to answer the complaint having been extended until January 6, 2021, doc. 8, the motion is GRANTED, in part. All pending deadlines in this case are STAYED until January 14, 2021. That brief stay will permit the Court to fully consider the propriety of the more extensive stay requested in the parties motion.Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/4/2022. (MD)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Samsung SDI America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baiad, Todd)
January 3, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Joint MOTION to Stay Case. (JH)
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Hunter on behalf of Andrea Monroe (Hunter, William)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung SDI America, Inc. identifying Samsung SDI Co., Ltd and Samsung Fire & Marine Insurance Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (Baiad, Todd)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Samsung SDI America, Inc.. (Baiad, Todd)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Defendant Samsung SDI America, Inc., a California Corporation answer due 1/6/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/20/2021. (pts)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Samsung SDI America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baiad, Todd)
December 20, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Samsung SDI America, Inc. answer due 1/6/2022. (pts)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Motions Pending . (Baiad, Todd)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Samsung SDI America, Inc. re #4 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baiad, Todd)
December 17, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (JH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 Deficiency Notice re: #1 Notice of Removal. Civil Cover Sheet is not signed. (csr)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/16/2021. (csr)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Samsung SDI America, Inc. from the State Court of Chatham County, State of Georgia, case number STCV21-02161. ( Filing fee paid on 12/16/2021 - $402 receipt number AGASDC-324). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: General Civil and Domestic Relations Case Filing Information Form, Complaint, Rule 3.2 Certification, Summonses, Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Special Process Server, Proposed Order, Orders, Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Special Process Server, Proposed Order, Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Special Process Server, Proposed Order, Notice of Filings, Proof of Service, Affidavit of Service, Answer of Defendant Sev Berwick Store LLC D/B/A Southeast Vapes and E-Cigs, A Georgia Limited Liability Company., #2 Exhibit 2: Sev Berwick Store, LLCs Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)
December 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance or a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice due by 12/26/2021. Re-File any Pending Motions (Previously filed in State Court) due by 12/30/2021. (csr)
December 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/30/2021 re: #4 Deficiency Notice. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Monroe
Represented By: George T. Major, Jr.
Represented By: William J. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Represented By: Lucas Drayton Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEV Berwick Store LLC a Georgia Limited Liability Company doing business as Southeast Vapes and E-Cigs
Represented By: Mason White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hohm Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (A-Z)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Inc. (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?