LM Insurance Corporation v. Halleluyah Restoration, LLC
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Halleluyah Restoration, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00011
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S EXTENSION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Answer due by 3/23/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/03/2022. (thb)
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Halleluyah Restoration, LLC. Responses due by 3/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Proposed Order)(Keene, Dennis)
March 3, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Halleluyah Restoration, LLC answer due 3/23/2022. (thb)
February 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Halleluyah Restoration, LLC answer due 3/9/2021. (slt)
February 21, 2022 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons to Halleluyah Restoration LLC Acknowledgement filed by LM Insurance Corporation. (Crosby, Scott)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by LM Insurance Corporation. (Crosby, Scott)
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LM Insurance Corporation identifying Liberty Mutual Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (Crosby, Scott)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff's #5 Amended Complaint has sufficiently alleged subject matter jurisdiction exists in this case and this case may proceed in the normal course. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 01/25/2022. (jlh)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by LM Insurance Corporation. Amended Complaint. (Crosby, Scott)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended #1 Complaint within fourteen days from the date of this Order listing all members of Halleluyah and their citizenships. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2022.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 01/24/2022. (jlh)
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Halleluyah Restoration, LLC. (csr)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice). (csr)
January 21, 2022 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (csr)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Halleluyah Restoration, LLC, filed by LM Insurance Corporation. $402.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: AGASDC-3268311. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LM Insurance Corporation v. Halleluyah Restoration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Scott J. Crosby, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halleluyah Restoration, LLC
Represented By: Dennis B. Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?