Nails v. St. Joseph Candler Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Angela Nails
Defendant: St. Joseph Candler Hospital and Dajaunia James
Case Number: 4:2022cv00077
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 ******* MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION for Sanctions with Brief in Support by St. Joseph Candler Hospital. Responses due by 6/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Windsor, Travis)
June 1, 2022 Filing 10 Special Appearance ANSWER to Complaint by St. Joseph Candler Hospital.(Windsor, Travis)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 Notice of Deficiency re #6 Notice (Other) filed by Angela Nails. (pts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2022: #1 Signature Page) (pts).
April 15, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint filed by Angela Nails. (gmh)
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #6 of Request for an Informal Discovery Dispute Conference. (gmh)
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Request for an Informal Discovery Dispute Conference by Angela Nails. (gmh)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/19/2022. (ca)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/4/2022. (ca)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Nails. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(ca)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angela Nails.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nails v. St. Joseph Candler Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Candler Hospital
Represented By: Travis D. Windsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dajaunia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?