Love v. Food Lion, LLC
Plaintiff: David Lamarr Love
Defendant: Food Lion, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00112
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations, by David Lamarr Love. (jlh)
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lamarr Love. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that the re #1 Complaint should be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 6/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/9/22. (loh)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/9/22. (loh)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lamarr Love. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (pts)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Love is, therefore, DIRECTED to file a supplemental application to proceed IFP within fourteen days from the date of entry of this Order. Love is DIRECTED to file his supplemental application again using this long form. In completing the supplemental application, he must answer every question to the best of his ability. Failure to comply with this Order may result in a recommendation that his case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/24/22. (loh)
May 24, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: supplemental application to proceed IFP due by 6/7/2022. (loh)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 ***Entered in Error*** Modified on 4/29/2022 (JH).
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lamarr Love. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(maa)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Food Lion, LLC, filed by David Lamarr Love.(maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2022: #1 Exhibits) (maa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Food Lion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lamarr Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Lion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?