Moore v. Hiscox, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Moore
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc. doing business as Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Case Number: 4:2022cv00147
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc. re #36 Reply to Response to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
August 10, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing by Catherine Moore re #36 Reply to Response to Motion Ex. B to Pl Reply in Support of Motion to Remand (Godfrey, Yvonne)
August 10, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Catherine Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Pl Reply in Support of Motion to Remand)(Godfrey, Yvonne)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Replies #28 due by 8/31/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/5/2022. (pts)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Replies #29 due by 8/31/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/5/2022. (pts)
August 4, 2022 Filing 33 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to file Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Lloyd's America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2022. (Savrin, Philip)
August 4, 2022 Filing 32 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to file Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2022. (Savrin, Philip)
August 4, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. re #29 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
August 4, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Lloyd's America, Inc. re #28 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
August 3, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Catherine Moore. (Godfrey, Yvonne)
August 3, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Catherine Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Pl Response to Lloyds MTD)(Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 29, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Catherine Moore re #26 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 27, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc.. (Savrin, Philip)
July 21, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate Cases filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc.. (Savrin, Philip)
July 21, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hiscox, Inc.. (Savrin, Philip)
July 19, 2022 Filing 23 CLERK'S ORDER granting #22 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) re #12 and #13 Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/3/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 07/19/2022. (thb) Modified on 7/20/2022 (thb).
July 19, 2022 Filing 22 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to File Responses to Motions to Dismiss Documents 12 and 13 by Catherine Moore. Responses due by 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Motion Extension of Time)(Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 15, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by Catherine Moore. Responses due by 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 -Jared Gamm LinkedIn, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Carrier Partnership)(Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Judge William T. Moore, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/11/22. (wwp)
July 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc. re #18 Response to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
July 8, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate Cases filed by Catherine Moore. (Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 8, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Hiscox, Inc. re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
July 7, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Fraudulent Joinder filed by Catherine Moore. (Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER staying all discovery deadlines until the entry of the district judge's Order on the last of the pending Motions to Reassign Case and Consolidate Cases in case numbers CV422-146, CV422-147, CV422-148, and CV422-035. The Clerk is directed to lift the Stay when the district judge's Order is entered. Within fourteen days of the lift of the stay, the parties are directed to confer and submit a Rule 26(f) Report in whichever cases remain pending at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/6/2022. (gmh)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Consent #10 Motion to Extend Temporary Seal of Exhibit 7 to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. The Clerk is Directed to maintain Exhibit 7 to the Complaint under seal for 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/6/2022. (csr)
July 6, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Lloyd's America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sabrina Miesowitz, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Will O'Connor)(Savrin, Philip)
July 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit February 4, 2022 Letter)(Savrin, Philip)
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London.(Savrin, Philip)
July 6, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: 8/5/2022 - Maintain Exhibit 7 to the Complaint under seal for 30 days re: #14 Order. (csr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Seal Document Ex. 7 to Plaintiff's Complaint by Catherine Moore. Responses due by 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Order Granting Pl Mot for Temporary Limitation of Access to Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McNeeley, Madeline)
June 30, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Consent MOTION to Seal Document Ex. 7 to Plaintiff's Complaint (slt)
June 24, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate Cases by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2022. (Savrin, Philip)
June 23, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Hiscox, Inc.. Responses due by 7/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Feb 4, 2022 Letter)(Savrin, Philip)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Consent #6 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal. Answer due 7/6/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/21/2022. (csr)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Answer by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc. Responses due by 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Savrin, Philip) Modified on 6/21/2022 (csr).
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 Statement of Motions Pending . (Savrin, Philip)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (gmh)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/16/2022. (gmh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2022: #1 Notice) (JH).
June 16, 2022 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (gmh)
June 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants, Answer Due 6/23/2022. (gmh)
June 16, 2022 Set Deadline: Compliance to #3 due by 6/26/2022. (gmh)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court of Liberty County, case number STSV2022000130, (filing fee $402.00 receipt number AGASDC-3367780), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents: Complaint, Summonses, Case Filing Information Form, Appointment of Process Server, Affidavits of Service, Motion and Order, Acknowledgments of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (gmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Hiscox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Moore
Represented By: Madeline Elizabeth McNeeley
Represented By: Jed Davis Manton
Represented By: Yvonne Susan Godfrey
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc.
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's America, Inc. doing business as Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Lee Dean Whatling
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?