Berry v. Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1 et al
Plaintiff: Victor Berry
Defendant: Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1, HMN Ocean Service CO. LTD., HMM CO. LTD and HMM Ocean Service CO. LTD.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00192
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity of citizenship
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Wilson, III on behalf of Victor Berry (Wilson, James)
September 21, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH)
September 20, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McRae, Colin)
August 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R. Sprouse on behalf of Victor Berry (Sprouse, Zachary)
August 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Savage, Sr on behalf of Victor Berry (Savage, Brent)
August 11, 2022 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by HMM CO. LTD, HMN Ocean Service CO. LTD., Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1.(McRae, Colin)
August 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by HMM CO. LTD, HMN Ocean Service CO. LTD., Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1 Certification of Notification to State Court Clerk (McRae, Colin)
August 11, 2022 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by HMM CO. LTD, HMN Ocean Service CO. LTD., Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1. (McRae, Colin)
August 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Notice of Removal was filed in the Southern District of Georgia. Set/Reset Deadlines: HMM CO. LTD answer due 8/18/2022; HMN Ocean Service CO. LTD. answer due 8/18/2022; Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1 answer due 8/18/2022. Compliance for attorney appearance due by 8/21/2022. (wwp)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/11/22. (wwp)
August 11, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
August 11, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by HMM CO. LTD, HMM Ocean Service CO. LTD., Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1. (wwp) Modified on 8/12/2022 (JH).
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 Statement enumerating Motions pending in case within State Court at time of Removal by HMM CO. LTD, HMN Ocean Service CO. LTD., Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1 re #1 Notice of Removal. (wwp)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE to attorney of the #1 Notice of Removal. (wwp)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HMM CO. LTD, HMM Ocean Service CO. LTD., Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1 from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV22-00716. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC - 3403667), filed by HMM CO. LTD, HMM Ocean Service CO. LTD., Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of jury verdict, #2 Exhibit B - State Complaint, State Summons, State Discovery, #3 State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Removal to State Court Judges, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp) Modified on 8/12/2022 (JH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Berry
Represented By: Brent Savage, Sr
Represented By: James H. Wilson, III
Represented By: Zachary R. Sprouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ship Owner Investment CO. NO. 1
Represented By: Colin A. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMN Ocean Service CO. LTD.
Represented By: Colin A. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM CO. LTD
Represented By: Colin A. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM Ocean Service CO. LTD.
Represented By: Colin A. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?