JACKSON v. NELSON
Petitioner: RODERICK BO JACKSON
Respondent: Warden CYNTHIA NELSON
Not Classified By Court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Case Number: 4:2022cv00250
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge as its opinion. Petitioner's #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is directed to submit the appropriate filing fee within twenty-one days of the service date of this Order. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/16/2022. (ca)
December 16, 2022 Set Deadline: Compliance #10 Order due by 1/6/2023. (ca)
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the U.S. Magistrate Judge that re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/9/22. (loh)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 Inmate Account Statement by RODERICK BO JACKSON. (pts)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RODERICK BO JACKSON. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (pts)
October 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE to all parties of record that a #1 Complaint was transferred to the Southern District of Georgia, Savannah, Division. (wwp)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing fee deficiency re #1 Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/15/2022. (wwp)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:22-cv-00161. Case transferred electronically
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the the Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 10/25/2022 (tlf).
October 25, 2022 Case electronically transferred out to the Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/8/2022 (tlf).
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl) (esl).
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst CYNTHIA NELSON filed by RODERICK BO JACKSON (Attachments: #1 state court case, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RODERICK BO JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden CYNTHIA NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?