Plair v. United States of America
Petitioner: Gregory Lamar Plair
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2022cv00279
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher L Ray
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James Christian Stuchell on behalf of United States of America (Stuchell, James)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Government to respond to the #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) within ninety days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/22/2022. (jlh)
November 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re Response of #1 Motion due by 2/20/2023. (jlh)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Gregory Lamar Plair. Responses due by 12/5/2022.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plair v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Lamar Plair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Justin G. Davids
Represented By: Christopher Howard
Represented By: James Christian Stuchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?