Carter v. Effingham County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Gary Anthony Carter, Jr.
Defendant: Effingham County Sheriff's Department, Winston Mock, Wellpath, Sergeant Lockett, E.S.C.O., Medical and Sergeant Over Booking
Case Number: 4:2022cv00288
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Lockett waiver sent on 1/12/2023, Answer due 3/13/2023. (gmh)
January 26, 2023 Filing 15 USMS Service Remark - Certificate of Service was signed by name not legible on 1/17/23. (wwp)
January 23, 2023 Filing 14 Letter from Gary Carter, Jr. (pts)
January 13, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 2/11/2023. (wwp)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process re #1 Complaint, #12 Amended Complaint, and this Order upon Defendants Mock and Lockett by the United States Marshal without prepayment of cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Mock - 285 Form, #2 Lockett - 285 Form.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2023: #3 GAS398 AO399) (wwp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2023: #4 AO399 GAS398) (wwp).
January 11, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re printing service packets due by 1/14/2023. (jlh)
January 9, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lockett, Winston Mock, filed by Gary Anthony Carter, Jr.(pts)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The deadline in the Court's #8 Order is vacated in part. Carter is directed to submit his Amended #1 Complaint no later than February 3, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/09/2023. (jlh)
January 9, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2023. (jlh)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gary Anthony Carter, Jr. (loh)
December 21, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER in reference to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Gary Anthony Carter, Jr. (loh)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VACATED IN PART. (See #11 Order.) ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit an Amended Complaint; ORDER Directing Payments be made from Prison Account of Gary Anthony Carter, Jr. Plaintiff owes an initial filing fee of $38.00. (Amended Complaint due by 1/20/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/21/2022. (gmh) Modified on 1/9/2023 (jlh).
December 19, 2022 Judge District Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to case. (loh)
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Gary Anthony Carter, Jr. (loh)
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT by Prisoner Gary Anthony Carter, Jr to collection of fees. (loh)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 12/23/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/9/2022. (ca)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 12/21/2022. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/07/2022. (Attachment: #1 Party's Statement Form.) (jlh)
December 7, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Gary Anthony Carter, Jr. Responses due by 12/21/2022. (Attachment: #1 Inmate Account Statement.) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
December 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Gary Anthony Carter, Jr. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Effingham County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Anthony Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Effingham County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Lockett
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.S.C.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Over Booking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?