Penick v. Jpay/Securus.co et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Ramon Penick
Defendant: Jpay/Securus.co and Georgia Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2022cv00298
Filed: December 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - No Record. Mail #2 Notice of Deficiency sent to Anthony Ramon Penick on 12/15/2022. (kjm)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk is directed to transfer this case re #1 Complaint to the Waycross Division for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/19/2022. (ca)
December 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance (signature page) due by 12/29/2022. (kjm)
December 15, 2022 Filing 4 Inmate Account Statement by Anthony Ramon Penick. (gmh)
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Ramon Penick. Responses due by 12/29/2022. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (gmh)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Pleading is not signed. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (gmh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2022: #1 Signature page) (gmh).
December 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Ramon Penick. (gmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penick v. Jpay/Securus.co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ramon Penick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jpay/Securus.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?