Etido Inyang v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Migdalia Vasquez Etido Inyang
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC and The Bank of Missouri
Case Number: 4:2023cv00289
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement as to The Bank of Missouri by Migdalia Vasquez Etido Inyang (Gomez, Octavio)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting re #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The Bank of Missouri answer due 11/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/14/23. (loh)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Bank of Missouri. Responses due by 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aust, Jonathan)
November 13, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (csr)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendant Trans Union LLC #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Trans Union LLC answer due 11/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/27/2023. (ca)
October 25, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Trans Union LLC. (McRae, Colin)
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Trans Union LLC. Responses due by 11/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McRae, Colin)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting consent #8 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Defendant shall have through and including November 10, 2023, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/25/2023. (csr)
October 25, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Bank of Missouri. Responses due by 11/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Briefs)(Aust, Jonathan) Modified on 10/25/2023 (csr).
October 25, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed). (csr)
October 25, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Bank of Missouri answer due 11/10/2023. (csr)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Migdalia Vasquez Etido Inyang. The Bank of Missouri served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Gomez, Octavio)
October 11, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Migdalia Vasquez Etido Inyang. Trans Union LLC served on 10/9/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. (Gomez, Octavio)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Migdalia Vasquez Etido Inyang. (Gomez, Octavio)
September 29, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jlh)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 09/29/2023. (jlh)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., The Bank of Missouri, and Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Trans Union LLC, and #2 Summons - The Bank of Missouri.) (jlh)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., The Bank of Missouri, and Trans Union LLC, filed by Migdalia Vasquez Etido Inyang. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3672934, $402.00.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etido Inyang v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Vasquez Etido Inyang
Represented By: Octavio Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Colin A. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Missouri
Represented By: Jonathan K. Aust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?