Linker et al v. Wormuth et al
Plaintiff: Henry Linker and Ashley Linker
Defendant: Stewart Hunter Housing, LLC, Christine E. Wormuth, Marne Homes, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Management, LLC, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Investments, LLC, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Development, LLC and Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv00085
Filed: May 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1346 (b) Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Restriction of Discovery Related Materials re: #15 Certificate of Service. (csr)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Linker, Henry Linker Service DF Wormuth Dept of Army (Attachments: #1 Exhibit service letter, #2 Exhibit service confirmation)(Darden, Linnie) Modified on 7/1/2024 (jrb).
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC answer due 6/3/2024. (csr)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Linker, Henry Linker. Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC served on 5/13/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. (Darden, Linnie) Modified on 7/1/2024 (csr).
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Linker, Henry Linker. Balfour Beatty Military Housing Development, LLC served on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Darden, Linnie)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Linker, Henry Linker. Balfour Beatty Military Housing Investments, LLC served on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Darden, Linnie)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Linker, Henry Linker. Balfour Beatty Military Housing Management, LLC served on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Darden, Linnie)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Linker, Henry Linker. Stewart Hunter Housing, LLC served on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Darden, Linnie)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC. (Levy, Susan)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1). Compliance due by 6/19/2024. If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1))(thb)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Development, LLC, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Investments, LLC, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Management, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing, LLC.(Levy, Susan)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. All Defendants, save Defendant Wormuth, shall have up to and including June 18, 2024, to file their desired responsive pleading. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to amend this deadline upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on June 4, 2024. (edd)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ashley Linker, Henry Linker. Responses due by 6/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order)(Darden, Linnie)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (thb)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/7/24. (loh)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Development, LLC, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Investments, LLC, Balfour Beatty Military Housing Management, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing, LLC, Christine E. Wormuth. (loh)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ashley Linker, Henry Linker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AGASDC-3818873. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linker et al v. Wormuth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Hunter Housing, LLC
Represented By: Susan J. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine E. Wormuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marne Homes
Represented By: Susan J. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Military Housing Management, LLC
Represented By: Susan J. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Military Housing Investments, LLC
Represented By: Susan J. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Military Housing Development, LLC
Represented By: Susan J. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC
Represented By: Susan J. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Linker
Represented By: Linnie L. Darden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Linker
Represented By: Linnie L. Darden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?