Rathbun v. Southcoast Medical Group LLC.
Plaintiff: Tamara Rathbun
Defendant: Southcoast Medical Group LLC.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00148
Filed: July 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its desired responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 25, 2024. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to amend this deadline upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on August 26, 2024. (edd)
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ***ENTERED ERROR*** Modified on 8/26/2024 (thb).
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Southcoast Medical Group LLC. answer due 9/25/2024. (thb)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (csr)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint ,, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Southcoast Medical Group LLC.. Responses due by 9/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freesmeier, Hillary)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary L. Freesmeier on behalf of Southcoast Medical Group LLC. (Freesmeier, Hillary)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamara Rathbun. Southcoast Medical Group LLC. served on 8/5/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Weekes, Mariya)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #4 , #6 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mariya Weekes. Allison McCarthy has entered an appearance in this case and vouches to satisfy the obligations of local counsel. Local R. 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on August 5, 2024. (edd) Modified on 8/5/2024 (csr).
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *******Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3874898, Fee Amount $200, by Tamara Rathbun. Responses due by 8/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCarthy, Allison)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3874898, Fee Amount $200, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mariya Weekes Receipt Number AGASDC-3867933, Fee Amount $200. (csr)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mariya Weekes. After 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 8/6/2024. (csr)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mariya Weekes Receipt Number AGASDC-3867933, Fee Amount $200, by Tamara Rathbun. Responses due by 8/6/2024. (McCarthy, Allison)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/17/24. (wwp)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Southcoast Medical Group LLC. (wwp)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southcoast Medical Group LLC., filed by Tamara Rathbun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number CGASDC - 3861912. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rathbun v. Southcoast Medical Group LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southcoast Medical Group LLC.
Represented By: Hillary L. Freesmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Rathbun
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth McCarthy
Represented By: Mariya Weekes
Represented By: Mariya Weekes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?