Altman-Chapman v. Southcoast Medical Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Kellie Altman-Chapman
Defendant: SouthCoast Medical Group, LLC and Privia Medical Group of Georgia, LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv00153
Filed: July 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kellie Altman-Chapman. Privia Medical Group of Georgia, LLC waiver sent on 9/3/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. (McCarthy, Allison)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Privia Medical Group of Georgia, LLC, SouthCoast Medical Group, LLC. (kjm)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Submitted (McCarthy, Allison)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. (#Click Here to View Standing Order) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 71/9/24. (wwp)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southcoast Medical Group of Georgia, LLC, filed by Kellie Altman-Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number BGASDC - 3866501. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altman-Chapman v. Southcoast Medical Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Altman-Chapman
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SouthCoast Medical Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privia Medical Group of Georgia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?