Medford v. The Kroger Co. et al
Plaintiff: Christy Medford
Defendant: XYZ Entity, John Doe and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00163
Filed: July 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2024. Discovery due by 9/30/2024. Motions due by 3/31/2025. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/16/2024. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/15/2025. Status Report due by 3/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/13/24. (loh)
September 12, 2024 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mann, William)
September 12, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing parties to file a revised Rule 26(f) Report no later than September 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/30/2024. (maa)
August 30, 2024 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mann, William)
August 30, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
July 29, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (maa)
July 29, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. (#Click Here to View Standing Order) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/29/2024. (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2024: #1 Corrected Main Document) (maa).
July 29, 2024 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. Compliance (Notice of Appearance) due by 8/8/2024. Pending State Court Motions due by 8/12/2024. (maa)
July 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co. from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV24-00909. Filing fee $405 receipt number AGASDC-3870774. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Answer of The Kroger Co., #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Substitution, #6 Exhibit E - Response to Defendant's Request for Admissions)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medford v. The Kroger Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: William S. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Medford
Represented By: Brian Joseph Kennedy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?