Sokolowski v. The Fresh Market, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Sokolowski
Defendant: John Doe and The Fresh Market, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00170
Filed: August 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by The Fresh Market, Inc..(Lovein, Norman)
September 17, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT SUSAN SOKOLOWSKI against John Doe, The Fresh Market, Inc., filed by Susan Sokolowski.(Bergen, Frederick)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion to Drop Defendant Cassandre Rublowitz as a Party Defendant. Plaintiff is directed to file her Amended Complaint by 9/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/13/2024. (amd)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/19/2024. Discovery due by 12/23/2024. Motions due by 5/2/2025. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 2/3/2025. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 2/20/2025. Status Report due by 4/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/13/24. (loh)
September 13, 2024 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2024, re #19 Order. (amd)
September 11, 2024 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bergen, Frederick)
September 11, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION Consent Motion to Drop Defendant Cassandre Rublowitz As A Party Defendant by Susan Sokolowski. Responses due by 9/25/2024. (Bergen, Frederick)
September 11, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION Consent Motion to Drop Defendant Cassandre Rublowitz As A Party Defendant , #17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER terminating #12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, and terminating #14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The parties are, therefore, DIRECTED to file a revised Rule 26(f) Report, addressing these scheduling deficiencies, no later than September 13, 2024. (Rule 26 Report due by 9/13/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/30/24. (wwp)
August 30, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
August 29, 2024 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bergen, Frederick)
August 29, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 9/12/2024. (thb)
August 29, 2024 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bergen, Frederick)
August 29, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
August 13, 2024 Filing 11 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Susan Sokolowski. (Bergen, Frederick)
August 13, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Susan Sokolowski. (Bergen, Frederick)
August 13, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick S. Bergen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bergen, Frederick)
August 7, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #7 MOTION to Dismiss. (thb)
August 6, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Cassandre Rublowitz, The Fresh Market, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Brief ISO MTD)(Dunn, Bubba)
August 6, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Related Cases 3.1. (pts)
August 6, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cassandre Rublowitz, The Fresh Market, Inc. (pts)
August 6, 2024 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Cassandre Rublowitz, The Fresh Market, Inc.. (pts)
August 6, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. (#Click Here to View Standing Order) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/6/2024. (pts)
August 6, 2024 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. Plaintiff's counsel intending to appear in this case must enter a notice of appearance within 10 days. Compliance due by 8/16/2024. (pts)
August 6, 2024 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (pts)
August 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cassandre Rublowitz, The Fresh Market, Inc. from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV24-01551. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BGASDC-3876421), filed by Cassandre Rublowitz, The Fresh Market, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Service Docs, #4 Fresh Market Answer, #5 Rublowitz Answer)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sokolowski v. The Fresh Market, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Sokolowski
Represented By: Frederick S. Bergen
Represented By: Chad A. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fresh Market, Inc.
Represented By: Norman Daniel Lovein
Represented By: Bubba B. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?