McCombs et al v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Hood, Latia Williams and Thomas L. McCombs, II
Defendant: Does I-V, Isaac Brown, ABC Entities I-V, Averitt Express, Inc., ICJ Transport, Inc. and ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv00202
Filed: September 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity of citizenship
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2025. Discovery due by 6/2/2025. Motions due by 2/2/2026. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 7/1/2025. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 8/1/2025. Status Report due by 1/2/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/6/24. (loh)
November 4, 2024 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray: Scheduling Conference held by VTC on 11/4/2024. (MD)
October 21, 2024 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING BY ELECTRONIC MEANS: Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2024 03:00 PM in SAV-MagVTC before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Parties will be contacted by email with VTC (TEAMS) login instructions. (MD)
October 21, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
October 18, 2024 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Morrison, Stephen)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time, until October 18, 2024, to file respond to the Notice of Removal and file the Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/8/2024. (kjm)
October 3, 2024 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Notice of Removal and 26f Report , by Thomas L. McCombs, II. Responses due by 10/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Stephen)
October 3, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Notice of Removal and 26f Report. (csr)
October 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W. Painter, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Painter, Paul)
October 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Morrison, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morrison, Stephen)
September 13, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by ACE American Insurance Company, Averitt Express, Inc., Isaac Brown. (Miller, Michael)
September 6, 2024 Filing 4 REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. ICJ Transport, Inc. answer due 9/11/2024. Notices to Appear/Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission due by 9/16/2024. Previously-filed state court Motions due by 9/20/2024. (gmh)
September 5, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (gmh)
September 5, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. (#Click Here to View Standing Order) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/5/2024. (gmh)
September 4, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Averitt Express, Inc., ACE American Insurance Company, Isaac Brown from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV24-00860. (Filing fee received $405.00, receipt number AGASDC-3895047) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings: Case Filing Information Form; Complaint; Averitt Express, Inc., Summons and Sheriffs Affidavit/Entry of Service; Isaac Brown Summons and Sheriffs Entry of Service; ICJ Transport, Inc., Summons and Sheriffs Entry of Service; ACE American Insurance Company Summons; ABC Entities I-V Summons; Does I-V Summons; Acknowledgement of Service of Defendants Isaac Brown, Averitt Express, Inc., and ACE American Insurance Company; Answer and Defenses of Defendants Isaac Brown, Averitt Express, Inc., and ACE American Insurance Company; Defendants Amended Answer to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Probate Court Documents, #3 Exhibit C - McCombs' Redacted Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit D - Brown's CDL, #5 Exhibit E - Averitt TN Filing Information, #6 Exhibit F - ACE GA SOS, #7 Exhibit G - ICJ Transport, Inc., #8 Exhibit H - Browns' Redacted Discovery Responses, #9 Exhibit I - State Court Notice of Removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (gmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCombs et al v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Hood
Represented By: Stephen D. Morrison, III
Represented By: Paul W. Painter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latia Williams
Represented By: Stephen D. Morrison, III
Represented By: Paul W. Painter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. McCombs, II
Represented By: Stephen D. Morrison, III
Represented By: Paul W. Painter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Brown
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Entities I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Averitt Express, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICJ Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?