Lockette v. Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Markus Lockette
Defendant: Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC and Privia Medical Group of Georgia, LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv00205
Filed: September 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Amended Joint Motion to Temporarily Stay Deadlines by Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freesmeier, Hillary)
November 1, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 Joint MOTION to Stay Amended Joint Motion to Temporarily Stay Deadlines (thb)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #15 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines. If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 11/14/2024. (thb)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freesmeier, Hillary)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines (thb)
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their desired responses to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 4, 2024. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to amend this deadline upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 1, 2024. (edd)
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (csr)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. (jrb)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Privia Medical Group of Georgia, LLC, Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC. Responses due by 10/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Mark)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Brian P. Adams (loh)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Murphy. Kristen Oliver has entered an appearance in this case and vouches to satisfy the obligations of local counsel. Local R. 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 24, 2024. (edd)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Correction of Exhibit A to Defendant's Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant's Notice of Removal)(Freesmeier, Hillary)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Markus Lockette. (Oliver, Kristen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2024: #1 Flattened PDF) (csr).
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Markus Lockette. (Oliver, Kristen)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Amanda Brooke Murphy Receipt Number BGASDC-3906416, Fee Amount $200, by Markus Lockette. Responses due by 10/3/2024. (Oliver, Kristen)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Tullos Oliver on behalf of Markus Lockette (Oliver, Kristen)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Amanda Brooke Murphy Receipt Number BGASDC-3906416, Fee Amount $200. (csr)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S EXTENSION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Privia Medical Group of Georgia, LLC answer due 9/27/2024; Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC answer due 9/27/2024. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 09/13/2024. (thb)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC. Responses due by 9/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freesmeier, Hillary)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to all counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC answer due 9/13/2024. Appearance Compliance due by 9/19/2024. State Motions due by 9/23/2024. (wwp)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/9/24. (wwp)
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC from Superior Court of Chatham County, Georgia, case number SPCV24-00895-CO. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGASDC - 3897094), filed by Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC. State Complaint, State Summons, State Service of process (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockette v. Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southcoast Health Administration Management, LLC
Represented By: Hillary L. Freesmeier
Represented By: Mark Benson Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privia Medical Group of Georgia, LLC
Represented By: Mark Benson Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markus Lockette
Represented By: Kristen Tullos Oliver
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Murphy
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?