Garza v. Barella et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Garza, IV
Defendant: Gavin S. Ballard, Michael Lanier, Nathaniel Brinson, Mitchell C. Mobley and Cory Michael Barella
Case Number: 4:2024cv00264
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment, filed by Rafael Garza, IV. (jlh)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Mitchell C. Mobley. (Lones, Laura)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mitchell C. Mobley filed by Mitchell C. Mobley. (Lones, Laura)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rafael Garza, IV. (amd)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Cory Michael Barella, Michael Lanier, Gavin S. Ballard, Nathaniel Brinson. (Hoss, Madeleine)
December 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Rafael Garza, IV. (wwp)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cory Michael Barella, Michael Lanier, Gavin S. Ballard, Nathaniel Brinson AMENDED re #7 MOTION to Dismiss. (Hoss, Madeleine) Link added. Modified on 12/31/2024 (thb).
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by Rafael Garza, IV. Responses due by 1/13/2025. (amd)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Mitchell C. Mobley. Responses due by 1/2/2025. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Garza, R. v. Mobley Motion to dismiss brief in support)(Lones, Laura)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Cory Michael Barella, Michael Lanier, Gavin S. Ballard, Nathaniel Brinson. Responses due by 1/2/2025. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lieutenant James Self, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Officer Cory Barella, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Officer Michael Lanier, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Officer Gavin Ballard, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Officer Nathaniel Brinson)(Hoss, Madeleine)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Chatham County's Sheriff's Office as to Gavin S. Ballard served on 11/27/2024, answer due 12/18/2024; Cory Michael Barella served on 11/27/2024, answer due 12/18/2024; Nathaniel Brinson served on 11/27/2024, answer due 12/18/2024; Michael Lanier served on 11/27/2024, answer due 12/18/2024; Mitchell C. Mobley served on 11/27/2024, answer due 12/18/2024. (SLC) Modified on 12/17/2024 (SLC).
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. (#Click Here to View Standing Order) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/25/2024. (csr)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gavin S. Ballard, Cory Michael Barella, Nathaniel Brinson, Michael Lanier, Mitchell C. Mobley. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Lanier, #2 Summons - Ballard, #3 Summons - Brinson, #4 Summons - Mobley)(amd)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law on Arrest Without Warrant by Rafael Garza, IV. (amd)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gavin S. Ballard, Cory Michael Barella, Nathaniel Brinson, Michael Lanier, Mitchell C. Mobley, filed by Rafael Garza, IV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amd)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (csr)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $405.00, receipt number 400001913. (amd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Barella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin S. Ballard
Represented By: Madeleine Hoss
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lanier
Represented By: Madeleine Hoss
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Brinson
Represented By: Madeleine Hoss
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell C. Mobley
Represented By: Laura L. Lones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Michael Barella
Represented By: Madeleine Hoss
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Garza, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?