Clark v. United States of America

Petitioner: Daniel Lee Clark
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2016cv00047
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Pierce
Referring Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. As a result, Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Petition is DISMISSED. In addition, Petitioner is not entitled to a Certificate of Appealability, rendering moot any request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/30/18. (trb)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Clark's 1 Motion as untimely. Alternatively, to the extent that the Court reaches the merits of Clark's arguments, it should DENY his Motion. It is also RECOMMEN DED that the Court DENY Clark a Certificate of Appealability and in forma pauperis status on appeal and DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Reco mmendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2018). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/8/2018. (csr) Modified on 2/8/2018 (csr).
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Hold Ruling in Abeyance. It is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in Case Number 5:16-cv-47 are STAYED until the Supreme Court issues a decision in the Beckles case. The Government shall file a Revised Response to Cl ark's Section 2255 Motion within twenty-one (21) days of the Supreme Court's issuance of an Opinion in Beckles. Clark may file a Reply to the Government's Revised Response within twenty-one (21) days of the Government's Revised Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/6/2016. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Lee Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?