Grantham v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Grantham
Defendant: United States Of America and Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 5:2016cv00061
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Brantley
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:2651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 23 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as applied to Defendant Veterans Affairs and Defendant United States of America. Plaintiff's request to voluntarily dismiss his claims against the Department of Veterans Affa irs will be GRANTED. Therefore, the Department of Veterans Affairs' 16 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT, the United States of America's 18 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against the United States of America will be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court requests that the parties clarify the status of the Veteran Affairs Clinic Nurse Manager and Dr. Christian Jimmerson within 10 days of the issuance of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 4/11/2017. (ca)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS as moot Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs' 16 MOTION to Dismiss and GRANT Defendant United States of America's 18 MOTION to Dismiss. I further RECOMMEND th at the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint, without prejudice, CLOSE this case, and DENY Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written object ions within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDAITON of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/21/2017. (ca)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file any response in opposition to the Defendants' 16 , 18 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Of America or to inform the Court of his decision not to oppose within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is hereby instructed to attach a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 and 12 to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/20/2017. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grantham v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?