Stewart v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Bryan Stewart
Defendant: Edwina Johnson, Elizabeth Bowles, Tom Gramiak, Adams, Burse, Bagley, Payne and Tiffany Lee
Case Number: 5:2018cv00037
Filed: April 20, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Ware
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER STAYING CASE. The Clerk is directed to administratively stay this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/14/21. (wwp)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING 95 Motion for Leave to Take Depositions for Use at Trial and to Offer Deposition Testimony at Trial. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/23/2021. (JH)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion in Limine. ORDER Overruling and sustaining in part 90 and 91 Motions and Exhibit Objections. Signed by Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/21/2021. (csr)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Exclude an Opinion of Defendants' Expert Witness Dr. Jiong Yan; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Witness Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 07/19/2021. (jlh)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that the parties file a proposed pretrial order by November 16, 2020. The Court will hold a pretrial conference on November 30, 2020 at 10 o'clock a.m. and a jury trial on February 23, 2021 at 9 o'clock a.m. in the federal courthouse located at 601 Tebeau Street, Waycross, Georgia 31501. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/20/2020. (MG)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Payne, Bagley, Burse, and Adams. Defendants' motion is DENIED as to Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Lee, Saenz, Johnson, and Gramiak. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/16/2020. (MG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bryan Stewart
Represented By: Mark Begnaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwina Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Gramiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?