Turner v. Selective Way Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kevin Turner
Defendant: Selective Way Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv00085
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Selective Way Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Crochet, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crochet, Gregory)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. Defendant Selective Way Insurance Company shall up to and including 11/30/18, to respond to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/26/2018. (ca)
November 16, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. (ca)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery , by Selective Way Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crochet, Gregory) Modified on 11/26/2018 (ca).
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Lamar Gibson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gibson, Douglas)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Crochet, Gregory)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crochet, Gregory)
October 30, 2018 Duplicate entry. (slt) Modified on 10/30/2018 (slt).
October 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Selective Way Insurance Company answer due 11/3/2018. (csr)
October 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Attorney Appearance or Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice due by 11/9/2018. Re-file any pending Motions (Previously filed in State Court) due by 11/13/2018. (csr)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE To All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/30/2018. (csr)
October 30, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2473899. (csr)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Way Insurance Company from Superior Court of Ware County, Georgia, case number SUV2018000501. (Filing fee paid on 10/30/2018 - $ 400.00; receipt number 113J-24738). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Complaint and Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Selective Way Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sheriff's Entry of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Gregory R. Crochet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Selective Way Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Way Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory R. Crochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Turner
Represented By: Douglas Lamar Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?