Coote v. United States Of America

Petitioner: Marvin Damian Coote
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 5:2018cv00096
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
0 Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
1 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Marvin Damian Coote. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/4/19. (slt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Stay lifted due to appropriations. (See MC 119-002, Docs. 1, 3.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marvin Damian Coote. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT by Prisoner Marvin Damian Coote to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that any and all civil cases pending in this district in which the United States, any of its federal agencies, or any of its officers and/or employees is a named party is hereby stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. Further, any and all civil cases pending in this district in which the United States Attorney or any Assistant United States Attorney is counsel of record, is hereby stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall, Judge Dudley H. Bowen, Jr., Judge William T. Moore, Jr., Judge Lisa G. Wood, and Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/11/2019. (slt)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 2/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/8/19. (slt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 Inmate Account Statement by Marvin Damian Coote. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marvin Damian Coote. (Attachments: #1 envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing deficiency re #1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. (cmr)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Marvin Damian Coote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(cmr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #2 Main Document) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coote v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Damian Coote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?