Christain et al v. The Okefenokee Charlton Trust et al

Plaintiff: Shannon H. Christian, David C. Christain and David C. Christian
Defendant: W. Hampton Beesley, American Mgmt Foundation Trust, The Okefenokee Charlton Trust and Does 1 to 50 (inclusive)
Case Number: 5:2019cv00034
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY Brief in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by The Okefenokee Charlton Trust. (Beaton, Theresa) Modified on 7/10/2019 (ca).
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing by American Mgmt Foundation Trust, W. Hampton Beesley, The Okefenokee Charlton Trust Amended and Second Certificates of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Second Certificate of Service)(Beaton, Theresa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief as to #13 Motion to Dismiss, by The Okefenokee Charlton Trust. (Beaton, Theresa)
June 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended certificates of service due by 7/3/2019. (slt)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion for Entry of Default; denying #17 Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing; deferring ruling on #15 Motion to Stay. All discovery in this action is stayed. Defendants are directed to file on the record, on or before 7/3/10, amended certificates of service which correctly state the method used to serve #15 Motion to Stay and #13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/27/19. (slt)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by David C. Christian, Shannon H. Christian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Response and discs placed in vault.)(slt)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by pro se litigant to participate in electronic filing by David C. Christian, Shannon H. Christian. Responses due by 7/2/2019. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot Defendants' #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/17/2019. (ca)
June 14, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 First MOTION to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support Thereof. (slt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support Thereof by The Okefenokee Charlton Trust. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Beaton, Theresa)
June 12, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #12 MOTION for Entry of Default (slt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by The Okefenokee Charlton Trust. (Beaton, Theresa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF by The Okefenokee Charlton Trust. Responses due by 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Patrick Brooks, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Shanell Smith)(Beaton, Theresa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default by David C. Christain and Shannon H. Christian. Responses due by 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Entry of Default)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #3 additional signature) (slt).
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss filed by David C. Christain and Shannon H. Christian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4A, #7 Exhibit 4B)(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #8 additional signature) (slt). Modified on 6/12/2019 (slt).
June 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss (slt)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by The Okefenokee Charlton Trust. Responses due by 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Beaton, Theresa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Davis Beaton on behalf of All Defendants (Beaton, Theresa)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying Request for Injunction #1 filed by Shannon H. Christian, David C. Christain. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/29/19. (slt)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David C. Christain, Shannon H. Christian. The Okefenokee Charlton Trust served on 5/22/2019; answer due 6/12/2019. (slt)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David C. Christain, Shannon H. Christian. W. Hampton Beesley served on 5/22/2019; answer due 6/12/2019. (slt)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David C. Christain, Shannon H. Christian. American Mgmt Foundation Trust served on 5/22/2019; answer due 6/12/2019. (slt)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by David C. Christain. (slt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/14/19. (slt)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Mgmt Foundation Trust, W. Hampton Beesley, The Okefenokee Charlton Trust. (slt)
May 14, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt numbers BWK008516 and BWK008517. (slt)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against All Defendants, filed by David C. Christain, Shannon H. Christian.(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christain et al v. The Okefenokee Charlton Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Hampton Beesley
Represented By: James L. Roberts, IV
Represented By: Theresa Davis Beaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mgmt Foundation Trust
Represented By: James L. Roberts, IV
Represented By: Theresa Davis Beaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Okefenokee Charlton Trust
Represented By: James L. Roberts, IV
Represented By: Theresa Davis Beaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50 (inclusive)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon H. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Christain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?