Orange v. Streat et al
Plaintiff: Shampoire Orange
Defendant: Doctor Peter Wrobel, LaKeisha Cray and Nurse Lynn Streat
Case Number: 5:2019cv00039
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Approving #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Shampoire Orange. The dismissal complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Accordingly, all claims asserted in this action are dismissed without prejudice. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/24/2019. (csr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), filed by Shampoire Orange. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/22/2019. (ca)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shampoire Orange. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shampoire Orange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope)(slt) Modified on 5/21/2019 (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orange v. Streat et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Peter Wrobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaKeisha Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Lynn Streat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shampoire Orange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?