Walsh v. Trust et al
Plaintiff: Caleb Walsh
Defendant: Quest IRA, Inc., American Management Foundation Trust and Carswell Cherokee Trust
Case Number: 5:2019cv00049
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2019. (ca)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Defendants #20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #20 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's #21 Motion to Seal; denying #21 Motion to Stay and GRANTS Plaintiff leave to amend his Complaint in accordance with this Order within fourteen (14) days of today's date. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/31/2019. (ca)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/10/2019. (csr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re: #22 Order Transferring Case. (csr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 Case transfer in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-01110. Case transferred electronically
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. #13 ) is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED. Plaintiff Caleb Walsh's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #8 ) is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/7/2019. (MWS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Emergency MOTION for leave to file under seal Wrongful foreclosure, Emergency MOTION to stay foreclosure sale by Caleb Walsh. (Attachments: #1 signature page, #2 notice of foreclosure)(Walsh, Caleb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by American Management Foundation Trust, Quest IRA, Inc., Carswell Cherokee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Pazienza, Marc)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff Caleb Walsh's Motion Requesting Electronic Filing Privileges (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. Walsh is directed to register for a CM/ECF account (login and password) with the assistance of the Clerk's Office as detailed herein. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/31/2019. (MWS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for electronic filing privileges for case by Caleb Walsh. (JCG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for preliminary injunction, #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Caleb Walsh. filed by American Management Foundation Trust, Quest IRA, Inc., Carswell Cherokee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pazienza, Marc) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (JCG).
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Vincent Pazienza on behalf of American Management Foundation Trust, Quest IRA, Inc., Carswell Cherokee Trust (Pazienza, Marc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #13 Report and Recommendations by Caleb Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A , #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KMM)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Caleb Walsh. Related case(s): yes (KMM)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #8 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Caleb Walsh; recommending that the motion be denied and the case transferred to the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/24/2019. (DMS)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Pro se Plaintiff Caleb Walsh's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #8 ) is referred to the Honorable Thomas G. Wilson, United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), for the issuance of a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/23/2019. (DMD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 5/22/19 as to American Management Foundation Trust. (KMM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 5/21/19 as to Carswell Cherokee Trust. (KMM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in support re #8 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Caleb Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(KMM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION for preliminary injunction by Caleb Walsh. (KMM)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff shall review and comply with the provisions of this Order, as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida, and any applicable statutes and regulations. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/14/2019. (TWL)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/10/2019. (TWL)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff Caleb Walsh's Verified Motion for Emergency Hearing (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/10/2019. (KAK)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing exhibits by Caleb Walsh (KMM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing by Caleb Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KMM)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of filing Exhibits from 2 other cases, by Caleb Walsh (KMM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against American Management Foundation Trust, Quest IRA, Inc., Carswell Cherokee Trust, Filing fee $400.00, receipt number TPA56487 filed by Caleb Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest IRA, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Vincent Pazienza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Management Foundation Trust
Represented By: Marc Vincent Pazienza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carswell Cherokee Trust
Represented By: Marc Vincent Pazienza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?