J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Patel
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Rupesh Patel
Case Number: 5:2019cv00056
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald D. Reemsnyder. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rupesh Patel D/B/A The Dome Event Center. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #1 Sealed Attachment) (csr).
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Responses due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Clerk's Entry of Default)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Rupesh Patel served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/10/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Rupesh Patel. (csr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons; pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (csr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (csr)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/9/2019. (csr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rupesh Patel, filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2636862. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald D. Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rupesh Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?