Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Bryan et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Stoners Pizza Joint and Donald E. Bryan
Case Number: 5:2019cv00062
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Donald E. Bryan.(ca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Donald E. Bryan on 8/20/19, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Wehunt, J.) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jlh).
September 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Donald E. Bryan answer due 9/10/2019. (jlh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on DB & DB Investments on 08/20/19, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Wehunt, J.) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jlh).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie Cohen Lonstein. J. Marshall Wehunt has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on August 29, 2019. (edd)
July 18, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number BWK008662. (ca)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint, filing fee was omitted. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/7/2019. (ca)
July 17, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julie Cohen Lonstein Fee Amount $200. (ca)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #1 PDF Error) (ca). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #2 Corrected PDF) (ca). Modified on 7/17/2019 (ca).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/17/2019. (ca)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Wehunt, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julie Cohen Lonstein Fee Amount $200, by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Bar Admission List, #3 Appendix Attorney Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wehunt, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Bryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoners Pizza Joint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: J. Marshall Wehunt
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?