Herrin v. Ace American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kenneth Edgar Herrin
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Not Yet Classified: Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00068
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of restriction of discovery related materials re: 16 Certificate of Service. (csr)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William H. Major, III. Martin A. Levinson has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 18, 2019. (edd)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David H. Wilson. Martin A. Levinson has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 18, 2019. (edd)
September 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William H. Major, III, Receipt Number 113J-2683462, Fee Amount $200.00, and #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David H. Wilson, Receipt Number 113J-2683438, Fee Amount $200.00. (csr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William H. Major, III Receipt Number 113J-2683462, Fee Amount $200, by Ace American Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/27/2019. (Levinson, Martin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David H. Wilson Receipt Number 113J-2683438, Fee Amount $200, by Ace American Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/27/2019. (Levinson, Martin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Levinson, Martin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of restriction of discovery related materials re: 9 Certificate of Service. (csr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Kenneth Edgar Herrin. (Gibson, Douglas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kenneth Edgar Herrin. (Gibson, Douglas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Lamar Gibson on behalf of Kenneth Edgar Herrin (Gibson, Douglas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace American Insurance Company identifying Chubb Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. (Levinson, Martin) Modified on 8/19/2019 (csr).
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ace American Insurance Company. (Levinson, Martin)
August 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance or a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice due by 8/19/2019. Re-File any pending Motions previously filed in State Court due by 8/23/2019. (csr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE To All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/9/2019. (csr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ace American Insurance Company from Superior Court of Ware County, Georgia, case number SUV2019000418. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2659905). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer, Case Filing Information, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Summons, Complaint, Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrin v. Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: David H. Wilson
Represented By: Martin A. Levinson
Represented By: William H. Major, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Edgar Herrin
Represented By: Douglas Lamar Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?