November 13, 2019 |
Filing 21
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David L. Rutan and Michelle E. Rutan. William Glenn Johns served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/28/2019. (csr)
|
October 30, 2019 |
Filing 20
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by David L. Rutan, and Michelle E. Rutan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Envelope). (csr)
|
October 29, 2019 |
Filing 19
ORDER granting #16 , #18 Motions for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall have through October 30 to file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/28/2019. (csr)
|
October 29, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2019 re: #19 Order. (csr)
|
October 25, 2019 |
Filing 18
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint re: #13 Order, filed by David L. Rutan, and Michelle E. Rutan. (Attachments: #1 Rico Statement, #2 Envelope). (csr) Modified on 10/25/2019 (csr).
|
October 25, 2019 |
Filing 17
RENEWED EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by David L. Rutan, and Michelle E. Rutan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of, #3 Envelope). (csr)
|
October 24, 2019 |
Filing 16
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint re: #13 Order, filed by David L. Rutan, and Michelle E. Rutan. Responses due by 11/7/2019. (csr)
|
October 23, 2019 |
Filing 15
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/11/2019, before Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Gilbert, Telephone number (912) 262-2608. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view <) Redaction Request due 11/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2020. (Gilbert, Debra)
|
October 22, 2019 |
Filing 14
Mail Returned as Undeliverable - William Glenn Johns has relocated - forwarding address unknown. Mail sent to William Glenn Johns via Fed Ex. (csr)
|
October 15, 2019 |
Filing 13
ORDER denying #10 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs are allowed to file an Amended Complaint within ten (10) days of today's Order. Plaintiffs are cautioned that failure to do so may result in this case being dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/15/2019. (ca)
|
October 15, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 10/25/2019. (ca)
|
October 11, 2019 |
Filing 12
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2019 re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by David L. Rutan, Michelle E. Rutan. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
|
October 9, 2019 |
Filing 11
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 03:00 PM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. ** Please note venue is BRUNSWICK **(WS)
|
October 9, 2019 |
Filing 10
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by David L. Rutan, Michelle E. Rutan. Responses due by 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ca) Modified on 10/11/2019 (ca).
|
October 9, 2019 |
Filing 9
AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Johnson re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (MG) Modified on 10/9/2019 (ca).
|
September 30, 2019 |
Filing 8
ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #5 Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/30/2019. (csr)
|
September 19, 2019 |
Filing 7
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #5 MOTION by Pro Se Litigant To Participate In Electronic Filing and #6 David L. Rutan and Michelle E. Rutan's Expedited Motion Seeking Appointment of a Receiver. (MG)
|
September 19, 2019 |
Filing 6
MOTION Seeking Appointment of A Receiver by David L. Rutan and Michelle E. Rutan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) Modified on 9/20/2019 (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #5 Exhibit A) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2019: #6 signature) (slt).
|
September 19, 2019 |
Filing 5
MOTION by Pro Se Litigant To Participate In Electronic Filing by David L. Rutan and Michelle E. Rutan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
|
September 18, 2019 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (MG)
|
September 18, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/2/2019. (MG)
|
September 16, 2019 |
Filing 3
Rule 26 Instruction ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/16/2019. (MG)
|
September 16, 2019 |
Filing 2
Summons Issued as to William Glenn Johns, The Carswell Cherokee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MG)
|
September 16, 2019 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David L. Rutan, Michelle E. Rutan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Envelope) (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2019: #14 signature) (slt).
|
September 16, 2019 |
Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number BWK008772. (MG)
|