Gowen et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jane Gowen and George Mark Gowen
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00082
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings (Phase One) due by 12/2/2019. Discovery (Phase One) due by 1/27/2020. Motions due (Phase One) by 2/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/18/2019. (ca)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials re #10 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1. (ca)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 **Filed in error**Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy)(Mikhalevsky, Alexander) Modified on 10/28/2019 (ca).
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Russell Kopp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kopp, Fred)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan T. Williams on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Williams, Nathan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Removal Notice. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/24/2019. (ca)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Removal Notice. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/24/2019. (ca)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (MG)
September 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Entry of Appearance for Plaintiffs' attorney due by 10/7/2019. Re-file any Motions due by 10/11/2019, pursuant to #3 Notice to All Counsel of Record. (MG)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record, re #1 Notice of Removal. (MG)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/27/2019. (MG)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, from Charlton County State Court, case number STSV2019000013. (Filing fee paid on 09/27/2019- $400; receipt number 113J-2693551) (Dietrichs, Mark). (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Notice of Filing Removal, #2 Defendant's Certificate of Service, #3 Complaint, #4 Lower Court Summons, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Affidavit of Courtnay Syphore, #7 Civil Cover Sheet). (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #8 Answer Filed in State Court) (MG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gowen et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Gowen
Represented By: Nathan T. Williams
Represented By: Fred Russell Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Mark Gowen
Represented By: Nathan T. Williams
Represented By: Fred Russell Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark T. Dietrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?