Thompson v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Joseph Lloyd Thompson
Respondent: United States Of America and Patrick Gartland
Case Number: 5:2019cv00089
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process upon: (1) the Attorney General of the United States; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia. The Court orders Respondent to show cause, in writing, why Petitioner's writ should not be granted by filing an answer within 21 days of service of the Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms). (csr)
December 3, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number BWK008933. (csr)
November 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/4/2019 re: #7 Order. (csr)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 and #5 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to pay the full filing fee. If the filing fee is not paid by that date, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. Local R. 4.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/13/2019. (csr)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Mail sent to Joseph Lloyd Thompson, containing copy of #3 , Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender- No Mail Receptacle- Unable to Forward. (MG)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Lloyd Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope.) REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
November 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/18/2019 re: #3 Order. (csr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - No mail receptacle - Unable to forward. #3 Order dated 10/21/19. Mail sent to Joseph Lloyd Thompson. (csr)
October 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/4/2019 re: #3 Order. (csr)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DEFERRING ruling on #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Lloyd Thompson. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to provide Thompson with a blank copy of the application to proceed in forma pauperis form which asks prisoner-petitioners questions about their inmate trust accounts on page 2 of this application. The Court DIRECTS Thompson to submit his application on the provided form within 14 days of this Order. The Court AUTHORIZES and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to change the docket and record of this case to reflect Patrick Gartland as the only named Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/21/2019. (csr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Lloyd Thompson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joseph Lloyd Thompson. (Page 6 of the first 8 pages was not submitted). (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Lloyd Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?