Kennedy v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Michael Sean Kennedy and Valeri Dmitrievich Pronine
Respondent: United States Of America and Patrick Gartland
Case Number: 5:2019cv00095
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Show Cause Response due by 1/3/2020) Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/20/2019. (MG)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Sean Kennedy, containing copy of #8 Order, returned as undeliverable. Return To Sender No Longer Here: 12/6/2019- Not Deliverable As Addressed- Unable To Forward. (MG)
December 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 12/17/2019. (MG)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO RESPOND to #7 Motion to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS Petitioner to file any objections to the Respondent's motion for dismissal or to otherwise inform the Court of his decision not to object to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/03/2019. (MG)
November 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss. (slt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Patrick Gartland. Responses due by 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy Klees w/attchs)(Patrick, Bradford)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to the Attorney General of the United States. Signed on 11/13/2019 by E. Sase. (MG)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to Patrick Gartland. Signed on 11/07/2019 by D. Myles. (MG)
November 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 11/28/2019. (MG)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia, Civil Process Clerk. Signed on 11/07/2019 by Rosa Oates (MG). Modified on 11/13/2019 (MG).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process of #1 Petition and this Order by registered or certified mail upon the Attorney General of the United States, the named Respondent, and the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia. The Court orders Respondent to show cause, in writing, why Petitioner's writ should not be granted by filing an Answer within 21 days of service of the Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM- 285 Forms.) (MG)
October 28, 2019 Filing fee paid: $5.00, receipt number BWK008846. (MG)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Forms). Compliance due by 11/14/2019. (MG)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Sean Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope). (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Sean Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Valeri Dmitrievich Pronine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Gartland
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?