Young v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ricky Young
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00107
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Andrew Saul for #1 Complaint filed by Ricky Young, and #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on 12/9/2019. Cert mail signed by Niavelios Wright on 12/9/2019. (csr) Modified on 12/26/2019 (csr).
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to the Attorney General of the United States for #1 Complaint filed by Ricky Young, and #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis served on 12/12/2019. Cert mail card signed by E. Sase on 12/12/2019. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2019: #1 Supplement) (csr).
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Andrew Saul (Leithart, Otto)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process upon the Defendant, the Attorney General of the United States and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms). (csr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ricky Young. (MG)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Young. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Ricky Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Young
Represented By: Kathy D. Hackel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?