Brantley County Development Partners, LLC v. Brantley County, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Brantley County Development Partners, LLC
Defendant: Chris Harris, Jesse Mobley, Brian Hendrix, Ray Griffin, Brantley County, Georgia, Skipper Harris, Randy Davidson and Brantley County Board of Commissioners
Case Number: 5:2019cv00109
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Defendants' #20 Motion to Allow Brief in Excess of Page Limits. The Court accepts Defendants' 39-page motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/23/2020. (csr)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. (Wise, Kyler)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. (Wise, Kyler)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Strike #21 MOTION to Dismiss Exhibits A, B, and C by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Responses due by 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Kathy)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Responses due by 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Brief In Excess of Page LImit)(Wise, Kyler)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (csr)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (csr)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Brantley County Board of Commissioners, Brantley County, Georgia, Randy Davidson, Ray Griffin, Chris Harris, Brian Hendrix, Jesse Mobley. Responses due by 1/17/2020. (Maine, Dana)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Brantley County Board of Commissioners, Brantley County, Georgia, Randy Davidson, Ray Griffin, Chris Harris, Brian Hendrix, Jesse Mobley. Responses due by 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Maine, Dana)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brantley County Board of Commissioners, Brantley County, Georgia, Randy Davidson, Ray Griffin, Chris Harris, Brian Hendrix, Jesse Mobley. Responses due by 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion)(Maine, Dana)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana K. Maine on behalf of All Defendants (Maine, Dana)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Clerk's Extension of time to File Answer to #1 Complaint re: #17 Motion. Defendants may file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint through and including 1/3/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/26/2019. (csr)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Brantley County, Georgia, Randy Davidson, Ray Griffin, Chris Harris, Brian Hendrix, and Jesse Mobley. Responses due by 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting motion to extend time to respond to Complaint)(Maine, Dana) Modified on 12/26/2019 (csr).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Ray Griffin served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Randy Davidson served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Jesse Mobley served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Chris Harris served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Brian Hendrix served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Brantley County, Georgia served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Brantley County Board of Commissioners served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyler L. Wise. L. Robert Lovett has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 9, 2019. (edd)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number BWK008935 re: #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (csr)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fee Amount $200, by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. Responses due by 12/17/2019. (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ray Griffin. (csr)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Submitted (LOVETT, LINWOOD)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fee Amount $200. (csr)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/27/19. (slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2019: #1 Corrected PDF) (slt).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (slt)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brantley County Development Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V-1, #23 Exhibit V-2, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y)(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2019: #27 Civil Cover Sheet) (slt).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $400, receipt number BWK008918 (slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley County Development Partners, LLC v. Brantley County, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Harris
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Mobley
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hendrix
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Griffin
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brantley County, Georgia
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skipper Harris
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Davidson
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brantley County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brantley County Development Partners, LLC
Represented By: L. Robert Lovett
Represented By: George H. Rountree
Represented By: LINWOOD ROBERT LOVETT
Represented By: Kathy L. Anderson
Represented By: Kyler L. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?