Lewis v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Daniel Lewis
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Classified By Court: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv00003
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Martin on behalf of James Daniel Lewis (Martin, Charles)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Attorney General of the U.S.. Certificate of service signed by E. Sase on 1/27/2020. (ca) Modified on 2/19/2020 (ca).
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Andrew Saul for #1 Complaint filed by James Daniel Lewis, #5 Order Directing USMS Service of Process on 1/21/20, signed by Cassandra Whyte. (ca)
January 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew Saul answer due 4/30/2020. (ca)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Andrew Saul for #1 Complaint filed by James Daniel Lewis, #5 Order Directing USMS Service of Process on 1/21/20, signed by Rosa Oates. (ca)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Blanchard on behalf of Andrew Saul (Blanchard, Jason)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process. A copy of the #1 Complaint filed by James Daniel Lewis and a copy of this Order shall be served upon the Defendant, the Attorney General of the U.S., and the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA without prepayment of cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/13/2020. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2020: #1 Prepared 285 form) (ca).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/13/2020. (ca)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Daniel Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by James Daniel Lewis. (ca)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by James Daniel Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Kathy D. Hackel
Represented By: Charles L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?