Guentangue v. Rivas et al
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Guentangue
Defendant: Major F. Rivas, Patrick Gartland, GEO Group, Inc. and Ronald Warren
Case Number: 5:2020cv00009
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Patrick M. Guentangue. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/6/2020. (csr)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Patrick M. Guentangue. The Court has assessed an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $31.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/6/2020. (csr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patrick M. Guentangue. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patrick M. Guentangue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Letter, #6 Envelope). (csr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Patrick M. Guentangue. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope). (csr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Patrick M. Guentangue to collection of fees. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Patrick M. Guentangue re: #3 Order. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 ADDENDUM to #1 Complaint filed by Patrick M. Guentangue. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)
January 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 2/14/2020 re: #3 Order. (csr)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to complete, sign and return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk by February 20, 2020. Plaintiff advised of PLRA procedures. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order, the Court will dismiss Plaintiff's case without prejudice for failure to prosecute and follow this Court's Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/21/2020. (csr)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patrick M. Guentangue. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patrick M. Guentangue. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guentangue v. Rivas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Guentangue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major F. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?