Spurlock v. Saul
Plaintiff: Heather Spurlock
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Classified By Court: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv00015
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Martin on behalf of Heather Spurlock (Martin, Charles)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Andrew Saul (Leithart, Otto)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to the Attorney General of the United States. Signed by E. Sase on 02/10/2020. (MG)
February 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew Saul answer due 5/21/2020. (MG)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia, Civil Process Clerk. Signed by Russell Smith on 02/11/2020. (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 USM-285 Return) (MG).
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to Andrew Saul. Signed by Cassandra Whyte on 02/10/2020. (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 USM-285 Return) (MG).
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Heather Spurlock. (slt)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heather Spurlock. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Heather Spurlock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurlock v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Spurlock
Represented By: Kathy D. Hackel
Represented By: Charles L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?