Sorgi v. Ear, Nose & Throat Clinic of Coffee County, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Sorgi
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Silveira, Westside Medical Center, LLC, Ear, Nose & Throat Clinic of Coffee County, P.C. and Westside Surgery Center, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00042
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrell W. Benton, III on behalf of All Defendants (Benton, Terrell)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT Substituting Westside Surgery Center, LLC in place of Westside Medical Center, LLC against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Sorgi.(Chance, Stephen)
May 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2020. (MG)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint naming the proper party within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 05/18/2020. (MG)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Ear, Nose & Throat Clinic of Coffee County, P.C., Jeffrey L. Silveira, Westside Medical Center, LLC.(Kazemian, Sheila)
April 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant. (ca)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Amend/ Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by Christopher Sorgi. Responses due by 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Substitute Party Defendant)(Chance, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2020 (ca). Modified on 5/18/2020 to reflect Motion to Amend, pursuant to Order #9 (MG).
April 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due for All Defendants by 05/26/2020. (MG)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Westside Medical Center, LLC. Westside Medical Center, LLC waiver sent on 03/27/2020, answer due 05/26/2020. (Kazemian, Sheila). Modified on 4/2/2020 (MG).
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey L. Silveira. Jeffrey L. Silveira waiver sent on 03/27/2020, answer due 05/26/2020. (Kazemian, Sheila). Modified on 4/2/2020 (MG).
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ear, Nose & Throat Clinic of Coffee County, P.C.. Ear, Nose & Throat Clinic of Coffee County, P.C. waiver sent on 03/27/2020, answer due 05/26/2020. (Kazemian, Sheila). Modified on 4/2/2020 (MG).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/27/20. (slt)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ear, Nose & Throat Clinic of Coffee County, P.C., Jeffrey L. Silveira, Westside Medical Center, LLC. (ca)
March 26, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2809872 (slt)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Sorgi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorgi v. Ear, Nose & Throat Clinic of Coffee County, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sorgi
Represented By: Stephen R. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Silveira
Represented By: Sheila Katherine Kazemian
Represented By: Terrell W. Benton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside Medical Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ear, Nose & Throat Clinic of Coffee County, P.C.
Represented By: Sheila Katherine Kazemian
Represented By: Terrell W. Benton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Sheila Katherine Kazemian
Represented By: Terrell W. Benton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?