Benavides et al v. Gartland et al
Petitioner: Gerardo Arriaga, David Fernandez, Jenner Benavides, Ajit Kumar, Winston Brown and Scott James
Respondent: Thomas Giles, Chad Wolf, Patrick Gartland, Matthew T. Albence and U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 5:2020cv00046
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Under Seal re 74 by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar (Isted, Kathryn). Modified on 6/10/2020 (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #1 Declaration of Caitlin J. Sandley, Esq., #2 Exhibits 1-3) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #3 Exhibit 4, Part I) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #4 Exhibit 4, Part II) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #5 Exhibit 4, Part III) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #6 Exhibits 5-7) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #7 Exhibit 8, Part I) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #8 Exhibit 8, Part II) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #9 Exhibit 8, Part III) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #10 Exhibits 9-19) (MG).
June 9, 2020 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Motion Hearing held on 6/9/2020 re #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gerardo Arriaga, David Fernandez, Winston Brown, Scott James, Ajit Kumar, Jenner Benavides. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
June 8, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence and Authority by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority, #2 Affidavit of Edin Yovani Pop Coy, #3 Affidavit of Josue Serrano Serrano)(Li, Hillary)
June 5, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/5/2020 03:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to the scheduled call. (km)
June 5, 2020 Set Deadlines: Compliance re Order #70 due by 6/12/2020. (ca)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to permit Petitioners to file their reply brief and exhibits under seal. Petitioners may file a redacted version for public viewing by June 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/5/2020. (ca)
June 4, 2020 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fontanazza Declaration, #2 Exhibit Warren Declaration, #3 Exhibit MDGA Order)(Leithart, Otto)
June 4, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 6/18/2020. (Reeves, Mark)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/2/2020. (ca)
June 2, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Intent to Reply by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf re #64 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Leithart, Otto)
June 2, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Intent to Reply by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf re #62 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Leithart, Otto)
June 1, 2020 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition filed by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. (Reeves, Mark)
June 1, 2020 Filing 63 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. Responses due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order)(Leithart, Otto) Modified on 6/2/2020 (slt).
June 1, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. (Reeves, Mark)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER granting #59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda N. Brouillette. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on June 1, 2020. (edd)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER granting #58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caitlin J. Sandley. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on June 1, 2020. (edd)
June 1, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caitlin J. Sandley Receipt Number AGASDC-2852463, Fee Amount $200. #59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda N. Brouillette Receipt Number AGASDC-2852490, Fee Amount $200. (MG)
May 29, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda N. Brouillette Receipt Number AGASDC-2852490, Fee Amount $200, by Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2020: #2 Statement of Cases) (MG).
May 29, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caitlin J. Sandley Receipt Number AGASDC-2852463, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2020: #2 Statement of Cases) (MG).
May 28, 2020 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/28/2020. (Tape #BWC-CHAMBERS.) (km)
May 27, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/28/2020 01:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (km)
May 27, 2020 Filing 56 OBJECTIONS to Petitioner's Requests for Production by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioners' Requests for Production)(Leithart, Otto). Modified on 5/28/2020 (MG).
May 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 6/4/2020. Replies due by 6/5/2020. (MG)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus . Responses due by 6/4/2020. Replies due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 05/21/2020. (WS)
May 21, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. Responses due by 6/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leithart, Otto)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #37 Motion for Emergency Inspection and Other Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/20/2020. (ca)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting #51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Crow. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 20, 2020. (edd)
May 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Crow Receipt Number AGASDC-2843721, Fee Amount $200. (MG)
May 19, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Crow Receipt Number AGASDC-2843721, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 6/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
May 18, 2020 Filing 50 STATUS REPORT by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Supplemental Declaration of Homer Ventures, M.D.)(Reeves, Mark)
May 18, 2020 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Leithart, Otto)
May 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #48 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (MG)
May 18, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. Responses due by 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leithart, Otto)
May 18, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. Responses due by 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Interim CDC Guidance)(Leithart, Otto)
May 18, 2020 NOTICE OF HEARING BY ELECTRONIC MEANS on Motion #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus : The Motion hearing will be held on 6/9/2020 09:00 AM in BWK-DistVTC before Judge Lisa G. Wood. Parties will receive login instructions via email. For Public access to this hearing, please dial 1-888-684-8852, enter the call access code 2296092 and enter the security code 1234.(WS)
May 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/18/2020, pursuant to #46 . (MG)
May 13, 2020 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/13/2020. (Tape #BWC-CHAMBERS.) (km)
May 12, 2020 Filing 45 Brief in Support re #37 MOTION for Emergency Inspection and Other Expedited Discovery In Support of Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gracie Willis, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 Dkt 52 Swain v. Miami-Dade County (20-cv-21457 S.D. Fla.), #3 Exhibit 2 Dkt 53 Seth v. McDonough (20-cv-01028 D. Md.), #4 Exhibit 3 Dkt 27 Cameron v. Bouchard (20-cv-10949 S.D. Mich.), #5 Exhibit 4 Dkt 53 Chun v. Edge (20-cv-01590 E.D. N.Y.), #6 Exhibit 5 Dkt 72-1 Chun v. Edge (20-cv-01590 E.D. N.Y.))(Reeves, Mark)
May 11, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for Emergency Inspection and Other Expedited Discovery In Support of Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Leithart, Otto)
May 11, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #34 MOTION to Dismiss. (MG)
May 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 5/21/2020. Replies due by 5/22/2020, pursuant to #42 . (MG)
May 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #37 MOTION for Emergency Inspection and Other Expedited Discovery In Support of Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 5/11/2020, pursuant to #42 . (MG)
May 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #37 MOTION for Emergency Inspection and Other Expedited Discovery In Support of Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction, pursuant to #42 . (MG)
May 8, 2020 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Telephonic Status conference on Motion #37 MOTION for Emergency Inspection and Other Expedited Discovery In Support of Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction : Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/13/2020 03:00 PM in BWC Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Counsel to receive dial-in instructions via email prior to hearing.(WS)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym and For a Protective Order; granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 05/08/2020. (WS)
May 8, 2020 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/8/2020. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
May 8, 2020 Filing 41 ******* MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memo ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Hillary Li, Esq., #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 Declaration of Homer Venters, M.D.)(Reeves, Mark)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Seal Declaration Exhibit . Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 05/08/2020. (MG)
May 8, 2020 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memo ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 5/22/2020. (Reeves, Mark)
May 7, 2020 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 5/8/2020 12:15 PM in L G Wood Chambers before Judge Lisa G. Wood. To dial in as a participant dial 1-888-684-8852, When prompted, enter Access Code: 1384176, When prompted, enter Security Code: 0046.(WS)
May 7, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym and For a Protective Order by Winston Brown, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reeves, Mark)
May 7, 2020 Filing 37 ******* MOTION for Emergency Inspection and Other Expedited Discovery In Support of Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, Winston Brown, David Fernandez, Scott James, Ajit Kumar. Responses due by 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memo ISO Motion for Emergency Inspection, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Rebecca Cassler, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 Notice of Inspection, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 Petitioners' First Interrogatories to Respondents, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 Declaration of Scott James, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 Declaration of Ajit Kumar, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5 Declaration of Winston Brown, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6 Second Supplemental Declaration of Jenner Benavides, #9 Exhibit Ex. 7 Second Supplemental Declaration of David Fernandez, #10 Exhibit Ex. 8 Second Supplemental Declaration of Gerardo Arriago, #11 Exhibit Ex. 9 Modeling Study, #12 Exhibit Ex. 10 Chunn v. Edge, Dkt 43, #13 Exhibit Ex. 11 Malam v. Adducci, Dkt. 53, #14 Exhibit Ex. 12 Banks v. Booth, Dkt 34, #15 Exhibit Ex. 13 Supplemental Declaration of Homer Venters, M.D., #16 Exhibit Ex. 14 Supplemental Declaration of Meredyth Yoon, #17 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reeves, Mark)
May 7, 2020 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against David Fernandez, Jenner Benavides, Gerardo Arriaga, Winston Brown, Ajit Kumar, Scott James, filed by David Fernandez, Jenner Benavides, Gerardo Arriaga, Winston Brown, Ajit Kumar, Scott James.(Reeves, Mark)
May 4, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #35 MOTION to Seal Declaration Exhibit, #34 MOTION to Dismiss. (MG)
May 1, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Declaration Exhibit by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. Responses due by 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leithart, Otto)
May 1, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. Responses due by 5/15/2020. (Leithart, Otto)
April 19, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/15/2020, before Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Gilbert, Telephone number (912) 262-2608. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view #Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 5/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2020. (Gilbert, Debra)
April 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #4 Motion for preliminary relief. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 04/18/2020. (WS)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #30 Motion Leave to File Supplemental Declarations ; granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms, MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 04/15/2020. (WS) Modified on 4/20/2020 (WS).
April 14, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE re #22 Notice of Hearing on Motion - publicly accessible audio conference line instructions. (WS)
April 14, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Meredyth Yoon (Supplemental), #2 Affidavit of Jenner Benavides (Supplemental), #3 Affidavit of David Fernandez (Supplemental), #4 Affidavit of Gerardo Arriaga (Supplemental), #5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations)(Li, Hillary)
April 14, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gartland Declaration, #2 Exhibit Allen Declaration)(Leithart, Otto)
April 14, 2020 ***Attorney Victoria Mesa-Estrada and Kathryn Isted added for Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, and David Fernandez added. (MG)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn Isted. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 14, 2020. (edd)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Victoria Mesa-Estrada. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 14, 2020. (edd)
April 14, 2020 Attorney Kathryn Isted added for Petitioners. (edd)
April 14, 2020 Attorney Victoria Mesa-Estrada added for Petitioners. (edd)
April 14, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and MOTION for Protective Order . (Reeves, Mark) Modified on 4/14/2020 (MG).
April 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathryn Isted. (MG)
April 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathryn Isted Receipt Number AGASDC-2822401, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
April 13, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and MOTION for Protective Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Leithart, Otto)
April 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Victoria Mesa-Estrada. (MG)
April 13, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Victoria Mesa-Estrada Receipt Number AGASDC-2822187, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
April 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing BY ELECTONIC MEANS on Motion #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and MOTION for Protective Order , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2020 10:00 AM in BWK-DistVTC before Judge Lisa G. Wood. Counsel will receive dial in instructions in a follow up email.(WS)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gracie Willis. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 10, 2020. (edd)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lorilei Williams. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 10, 2020. (edd)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Phi Nguyen. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 10, 2020. (edd)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hillary Li. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 10, 2020. (edd)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Chavez. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 10, 2020. (edd)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Cassler. Mark H. Reeves has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 10, 2020. (edd)
April 10, 2020 Attorney Gracie Willis added for Petitioners. (edd)
April 10, 2020 Attorney Lorilei Williams added for Petitioners. (edd)
April 10, 2020 Attorney Phi Nguyen added for Petitioners. (edd)
April 10, 2020 *** Attorney Hillary Li added for Petitioners. (edd)
April 10, 2020 *** Attorney Paul Chavez added for Petitioners. (edd)
April 10, 2020 *** Attorney Rebecca Cassler added for Petitioners. (edd)
April 9, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to divisional transfer of case. Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray no longer assigned to the case. (slt)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to Transfer this Case to the Waycross Division. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/9/20. (jrb)
April 9, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Phi Nguyen, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hillary Li, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Chavez, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lorilei Williams, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gracie Willis, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Cassler. (wwp)
April 9, 2020 ***Staff notes - All pro hac applicants (Docket entries 6-11) have never appeared in the SDGA. (wwp)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Phi Nguyen, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hillary Li, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Chavez, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lorilei Williams, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gracie Willis, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Cassler. (wwp) Modified on 4/9/2020 (slt).
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (wwp)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S. Immagration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf (Leithart, Otto)
April 8, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2819558. (jrb)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gracie Willis Receipt Number AGASDC-2820053, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lorilei Williams Receipt Number AGASDC-2820052, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Phi Nguyen Receipt Number AGASDC-2820051, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hillary Li Receipt Number AGASDC-2820050, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Chavez Receipt Number AGASDC-2820037, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Cassler Receipt Number AGASDC-2820034, Fee Amount $200, by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Reeves, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 ******* MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and, MOTION for Protective Order by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs)(Reeves, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 ******* MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Mark H. Reeves, Esq., #3 Exhibit 1 - Greifinger Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 - Cummings Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 - Zeidan Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 - Sandweg Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 - Yoon Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 - Rivera Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 - Benavides Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 - Fernandez Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 - Arriaga Declaration)(Reeves, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, Patrick Gartland, Thomas Giles, U.S. Immagration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (jrb)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Gerardo Arriaga, Jenner Benavides, David Fernandez. (jrb)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief, filed by David Fernandez, Jenner Benavides, Gerardo Arriaga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) Modified on 4/9/2020 (jrb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benavides et al v. Gartland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Giles
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Gartland
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerardo Arriaga
Represented By: Mark Howard Reeves
Represented By: Hillary Li
Represented By: Amanda N. Brouillette
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Caitlin J. Sandley
Represented By: Lorilei Williams
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Kathryn Isted
Represented By: Victoria Mesa-Estrada
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Represented By: Gracie Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Fernandez
Represented By: Mark Howard Reeves
Represented By: Hillary Li
Represented By: Amanda N. Brouillette
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Caitlin J. Sandley
Represented By: Lorilei Williams
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Kathryn Isted
Represented By: Victoria Mesa-Estrada
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Represented By: Gracie Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jenner Benavides
Represented By: Mark Howard Reeves
Represented By: Hillary Li
Represented By: Amanda N. Brouillette
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Caitlin J. Sandley
Represented By: Lorilei Williams
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Kathryn Isted
Represented By: Victoria Mesa-Estrada
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Represented By: Gracie Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ajit Kumar
Represented By: Amanda N. Brouillette
Represented By: Mark Howard Reeves
Represented By: Caitlin J. Sandley
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Winston Brown
Represented By: Amanda N. Brouillette
Represented By: Mark Howard Reeves
Represented By: Caitlin J. Sandley
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott James
Represented By: Amanda N. Brouillette
Represented By: Mark Howard Reeves
Represented By: Caitlin J. Sandley
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?