Roundtree v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Chastity Roundtree
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00050
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (km)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for Production of Administrative Record by Defendant due by 7/21/2020. Discovery due by 9/28/2020. Motions due by 10/28/2020. Status Report due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 06/23/2020. (MG)
June 17, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MG)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crow, Nikole) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2020: #1 Corrected Signature Page) (MG).
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant H. Bower, Jr on behalf of Chastity Roundtree (Bower, Bryant)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Bondurant, Elizabeth)
May 6, 2020 Set Deadlines: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer due 5/13/2020. Compliance: Notice of Appearance - Plaintiff due by 5/16/2020. (ca)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 REMOVAL NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Pending Motions filed in State Court due by 5/20/2020. (ca)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/6/2020. (ca)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (ca)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company from State Court of Ware County, Georgia, case number STSV2020000050. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2835941). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - General Case Filing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sheriff's Entry of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roundtree v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Nikole M. Crow
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chastity Roundtree
Represented By: Bryant H. Bower, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?