Tejeda Diaz v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Manuel S. Tejeda Diaz
Respondent: Thomas Giles, Chad Wolf, James McHenry, Patrick Gartland and William Barr
Case Number: 5:2020cv00068
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #18 Notice. Set Deadlines: Compliance: Application for PHV due by 6/12/2020. (ca)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #17 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (ca)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02132. Case transferred electronically
May 28, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
May 28, 2020 Case transferred electronically to District of USDC SD GA, Waycross Division.(tcc)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - For the foregoing reasons (SEE ORDER), IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA, THE WAYCROSS DIVISION, along with all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings and exhibits (if any) filed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 5/28/2020. (tcc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order GRANTING #13 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-02132-JKL. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 5/22/2020. (dmb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Patrick Gartland. (rsh)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to James McHenry. (rsh)
May 22, 2020 Submission of #10 Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge, submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (rsh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (dmb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Manuel S. Tejeda Diaz Notice, Consent, And Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Zambrano, Shirley) Modified on 5/22/2020 to correct event type; re-docketed at docket number 13 (dmb).
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shirley Cristina Zambrano on behalf of Manuel S. Tejeda Diaz (Zambrano, Shirley)
May 21, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Review, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Manuel S. Tejeda Diaz (Zambrano, Shirley)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Manuel S. Tejeda Diaz (Zambrano, Shirley)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Byung J. Pak. (eop)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas Giles. (eop)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Chad Wolf. (eop)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to William Barr. (eop)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Manuel S. Tejeda Diaz. ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AGANDC-9708548.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Exhibit -I, #10 Exhibit -J, #11 Exhibit -K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2020: #13 Proposed Incorrect Summon(s)- Garland, #14 Proposed Incorrect Summons -McHenry) (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tejeda Diaz v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel S. Tejeda Diaz
Represented By: Shirley Cristina Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?