Gonzalez-Azuaje v. Wood et al
Petitioner: Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje
Respondent: Officer Wood and Mr. Wright
Case Number: 5:2020cv00070
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Compliance due by 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Forms) (MG)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #11 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (MG)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01789. Case transferred electronically
May 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje re #10 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jed)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation recommending that this action be TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Georgia, Waycross Division. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Southern District of Georgia, Waycross Division. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/29/2020. (jed)
May 29, 2020 Docket reviewed by SDG. No conflict. (ash)
May 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje re #9 Notice (Other). (jed)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje re #5 Notice (Other). Return to Sender. No Mail Receptacle. Unable to Forward. (tcc)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Return to Sender. No Mail Receptacle. Unable to Forward. (tcc)
May 18, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje re #2 Order (jpa)
May 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje re #5 Notice (Other). (jed)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jed)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/30/2020. (jed)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus recommending that this habeas action be TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Georgia, Waycross Division. See L.R. 3.1(B)(4), NDGa. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/30/2020. (jed)
April 28, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop)
April 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez-Azuaje re #2 Order and NEF. (eop)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez-Azuaje. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Azuaje v. Wood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonardo Enrique Gonzalez Azuaje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?