Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Amerson Enterprises Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Amerson Enterprises Inc., Johnny Amerson, Janet Smith, William Amerson and Loyd Amerson
Case Number: 5:2020cv00108
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Amerson Enterprises Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Tucker, Kristin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Janet Smith served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Tucker, Kristin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. William Amerson served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Tucker, Kristin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Loyd Amerson served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Tucker, Kristin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Johnny Amerson served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Tucker, Kristin)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Janet Smith. (Madison, Ashleigh)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Dietrichs, Mark)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Janet Smith.(Madison, Ashleigh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Dietrichs, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Johnny Amerson, Loyd Amerson, William Amerson, Amerson Enterprises Inc., and Janet Smith. (jlh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 Summons - Johnny Amerson, #2 Summons - Loyd Amerson, #3 Summons - William Amerson, #4 Summons - Janet Smith)(Dietrichs, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #5 Corrected Main Document) (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #6 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/18/2020. (ca)
August 18, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AGASDC-2905378. (ca)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Amerson Enterprises Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerson Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Amerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Smith
Represented By: Ashleigh Ruth Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Amerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyd Amerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark T. Dietrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?