Amin v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Dr. Mahendra Amin, M.D.
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00056
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany Watkins. Scott Grubman has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 16, 2021. (edd)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stacey Evans. Scott Grubman has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 16, 2021. (edd)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mahendra Amin, MD. NBCUniversal Media, LLC waiver sent on 9/14/2021, answer due 11/13/2021. (Grubman, Scott)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Mahendra Amin, MD re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany N Watkins Receipt Number AGASDC-3183646, Fee Amount $200, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Grubman, Scott)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Mahendra Amin, MD re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stacey G Evans Receipt Number AGASDC-3183585, Fee Amount $200, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Grubman, Scott)
September 14, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany N Watkins Receipt Number AGASDC-3183646, Fee Amount $200,, #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stacey G Evans Receipt Number AGASDC-3183585, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany N Watkins, #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stacey G Evans. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/27/2021. (thb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany N Watkins Receipt Number AGASDC-3183646, Fee Amount $200, by Mahendra Amin, MD. Responses due by 9/24/2021. (Grubman, Scott)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stacey G Evans Receipt Number AGASDC-3183585, Fee Amount $200, by Mahendra Amin, MD. Responses due by 9/24/2021. (Grubman, Scott)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/10/2021. (ca)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NBCUniversal Media, LLC, filed by Mahendra Amin, MD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
September 9, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3182379. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amin v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Mahendra Amin, M.D.
Represented By: Scott Robert Grubman
Represented By: Stacey Godfrey Evans
Represented By: Tiffany N. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?