Wilson v. Waycross Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Randall Wilson
Defendant: Waycross Police Department, Dustin Crews and Stuart Deloach
Case Number: 5:2021cv00060
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Randall Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/29/2021. (ca)
November 15, 2021 Partial filing fee paid: $ 5.00, receipt number BWK011324. (gmh)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, by Randall Wilson. (jlh)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Randall Wilson to collection of fees. (jlh)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to complete, sign and return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk by December 1, 2021. Plaintiff advised of PLRA procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/1/2021. (csr)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Signature Page re #3 Notice, by Randall Wilson. (jlh)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pleading is not signed. (csr)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randall Wilson. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Randall Wilson. (csr)
October 7, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/21/2021 re: #3 Deficiency Notice. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Waycross Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waycross Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Deloach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?