Clue v. Greenawalt et al
Petitioner: O'Neil Richard Clue
Respondent: Daniel Greenawalt, Francisco Madrigal, Tae D. Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 5:2021cv00080
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Daniel Greenawalt on January 10, 2022, filed by O'Neil Richard Clue. (Repko, III, William)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen Cornett. William Repko, III has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Courts Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 15, 2021. (edd)
December 14, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen S. Cornett Fee Amount $200. (JH)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen S. Cornett Fee Amount $200, by O'Neil Richard Clue. Responses due by 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order of Admission)(Repko, III, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2021: #3 Statement Regarding Prior Cases) (JH).
December 13, 2021 PRO HAC VICE PAID for Kathleen S. Cornett; Amount $200, Receipt # BWK011391. Date: 12/13/2021 (gmh)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Daniel Greenawalt, Tae D. Johnson, Francisco Madrigal, Alejandro Mayorkas. (gmh)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by O'Neil Richard Clue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (gmh)
December 10, 2021 Filing fee received: $5, receipt number BWK011388. (gmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clue v. Greenawalt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: O'Neil Richard Clue
Represented By: William Joseph Repko, III
Represented By: Kathleen S. Cornett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Greenawalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Francisco Madrigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tae D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?