Hobbs v. Folkston Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Quadray Hobbs
Defendant: Folkston Police Department, Charlton County Sheriff's Office and Waycross Judicial Circuit District Attorney's Office
Case Number: 5:2022cv00075
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER deferring ruling on #2 and #12 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.The Court directs Plaintiff to submit his application on the provided form within 14 days of this Order. PLRA due by 2/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 01/31/2023. (Attachment: #1 IFP Form.) (jlh)
January 19, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Quadray Hobbs. (loh)
January 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE by Quadray Hobbs re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, #3 Order re Magistrate Assignment. (kjm)
January 12, 2023 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to the case. (kjm)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to provide Plaintiff with a blank copy of the application to proceed in forma pauperis form. The Court also DIRECTS Plaintiff to submit his application on the provided form within 14 days of this Order. The Court also DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to re-mail a copy of the Order and Notice at Documents re #3 - #4 to Plaintiff at his last known address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/4/23. (loh)
January 4, 2023 Set/Reset Deadline: IFP Application due by 1/18/2023. (loh)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from Quadray Hobbs. (kjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2023: #1 Readable envelope) (gmh).
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Transferred to Telfair SP. Mail #4 Notice of Deficiency sent to Quadray Hobbs on 12/19/2022. (kjm)
December 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: #3 Order re Magistrate Assignment. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 1/2/2023. (csr)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Folkston Police Department, Charlton County Sheriff's Office, Waycross Judicial Circuit District Attorney's Office. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 12/19/2022. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement) (ca)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quadray Hobbs. Responses due by 12/19/2022. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Quadray Hobbs.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. Folkston Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quadray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folkston Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waycross Judicial Circuit District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?